Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Northern Insurance Co Of New York, Maryland Casualty Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Christopher E. Mumm, against Boehler, Jayne, Boehler, Bobbie, Bee-Lure Painting A Close Corp, represented by Matthew J. Christian, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Delaney, Kathleen E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDelaney, Kathleen E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2007 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 29 Case reassigned from Judge Susan Scann Dept 29 |
|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 29 Case reassigned from Judge Kathleen E. Delaney |
|
May 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Order to Statistically Close Case | |
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial Vacated - per Judge Judge: Delaney, Kathleen E. |
|
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
February 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
February 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Pretrial/Calendar Call Mr. Christian advised no discovery was ever conducted, there has been no contact with Pltfs or their counsel, and Deft. Bee-Lure Painting A Close Corp. is currently in bankruptcy. Further, he requested matter be DISMISSED; COURT SO ORDERED. COURT FURTHER ORDERED 02/22/10 trial VACATED. Mr. Christian to prepare Order. Judge: Delaney, Kathleen E. |
|
January 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order to Vacate Hearing on Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment |
|
January 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Delaney, Kathleen E. |
|
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order to Vacate Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.