Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hd Supply Lp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Frank M. Flansburg, Iii, against Western Insurance Co, Silver State Plumbing Inc, Chateau Properties Iii Llc, represented by Vonn Jess Jenkins, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Walsh, Jessie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWalsh, Jessie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2007 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 3 Case Reassignment from Judge Tierra Jones to Judge Douglas W. Herndon |
|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change From Judge Jessie Walsh to Judge Tierra Jones Judge: ChangeFrom Judge Jessie Walsh to Judge Tierra Jones |
|
September 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL |
|
September 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
May 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion to Consolidate C&C CONCRETE'S MTN TO CONSOLIDATE WITH A552700, A549437, A553364, A549417/3 Judge: Walsh, Jessie |
|
April 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY CONFERENCE Court Clerk: Jennifer Lott Heard By: BONNIE BULLA Mr. Gerber confirmed the case has settled, and counsel will circulate a Stipulation and Order to end the case. COMMISSIONER RECOMMENDED, matter OFF CALENDAR. Judge: Bulla, Bonnie |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition HD SUPPLY LPS LIMITED OPPOSITION TO C AND C CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION INCSMOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH CASE NOS A549437 A553364 A549417 A544466 A544178 AMD A542655 |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY CONFERENCE Court Clerk: Jennifer Lott Heard By: BONNIE BULLA Commissioner indicate matter was taken off calendar based on a letter from Mr. Jenkins. Mr. Gerber stated parties discussed resolution, there is no settlement, and Pltf's case is over based on a Motion for Summary Judgment on 4/9/08. COMMISSIONER RECOMMENDED, matter CONTINUED two weeks; Mr. Jenkins to APPEAR and EXPLAIN status of case to Commissioner; Mr. Gerber to send a letter to Mr. Jenkins advising counsel to appear on 4/23/08. Judge: Bulla, Bonnie |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment PLTF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT /2 Court Clerk: Teri Braegelmann Heard By: Jessie Walsh Court Noted case settled, and ORDERED, matter OFF CALENDAR. Judge: Walsh, Jessie |
|
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion C&C CONCRETE'S MTN TO CONSOLIDATE WITH A552700, A549437, A553364, A549417/3 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.