Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sun Colony Summerlin Homes Llc, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case represented by Barney C. Ales, against Heekin, Linda J, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Jackie Glass presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJackie Glass Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2007 |
CategoryAppeal From Lower Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judicial Elections 2014 - Case Reassignment District Court Judicial Officer Reassignment 2014 Judge: Reassignment 2014 |
|
June 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 19 Reassigned from Department 5 |
|
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Order to Statistically Close Case | |
October 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Decision Vacated Judge: Glass, Jackie |
|
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Remittitur to the Lower Court REMITTITUR |
|
October 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER RE: DECISION Court Clerk: Sandra Jeter Heard By: Jackie Glass After hearing arguments from counsel for Appellant and the Respondent and reviewing the Briefs UPHOLDS THE LOWER COURT'S DECISION and FINDS IN FAVOR OF THE RESPONDENT. COURT FURTHER ORDERED, matter REMANDED to JUSTICE COURT for enforcement of the Judgment rendered on May 8, 2007. Status check date VACATED. CLERK'S NOTE: 10/12/07 - I placed a copy of this minute order in the attorney bin of Goold Patterson et al and mailed same to Linda Heekin, 10223 Sofferto Avenue, LVN 89135./sj Judge: Glass, Jackie |
|
October 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type MINUTE ORDER RE: DECISION |
|
October 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
APPEAL FROM LOWER COURT Court Clerk: Sandra Jeter Reporter/Recorder: Rachelle Hamilton Heard By: Jackie Glass Following arguments by Ms. Heekin and Mr. Ales, Court NOTED it needs to review Judge Silver's ruling and ORDERED, matter SET for DECISION. 10/24/07 DECISION (CHAMBERS CALENDAR) Judge: Glass, Jackie |
|
October 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type DECISION: APPEAL FROM LOWER COURT (VJ 10/12/07) |
|
October 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Brief APPELLANTS REPLY BRIEF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.