Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Carrier, Dawn, Anderson, David, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Clark Seegmiller, against Newman, Brian J, Holler, Jack T, represented by Michael C. Mills, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Walsh, Jessie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWalsh, Jessie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 06, 2007 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 3 Case Reassignment from Judge Tierra Jones to Judge Douglas W. Herndon |
|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change From Judge Jessie Walsh to Judge Tierra Jones Judge: ChangeFrom Judge Jessie Walsh to Judge Tierra Jones |
|
September 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
April 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice | |
April 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment of Dismissal | |
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement DEFT HOLLER'S MTN DETERMINE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT /3 Court Clerk: Teri Braegelmann Heard By: Jessie Walsh COURT ORDERED motion VACATED as MOOT. Court notes there is a stip and order filed on 07/15/08 by defendant Holler. Plaintiff's including Dakota, already agreed to dismiss this case with prejudice, with each party with each party bearing its own attorney fees and costs. Further, Court notes the motion was not served upon the other defendant or the intervening Insurance Company. Judge: Walsh, Jessie |
|
January 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement DEFT HOLLER'S MTN DETERMINE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT /3 Court Clerk: Teri Braegelmann Heard By: Jessie Walsh Judge: Walsh, Jessie |
|
December 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion DEFT HOLLER'S MTN DETERMINE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT /3 |
|
July 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL |
|
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement PLTF'S MTN TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT & ENFORCE SETTLEMENT/2 Court Clerk: Teri Braegelmann Heard By: Jessie Walsh COURT ORDERED, motion GRANTED. Judge: Walsh, Jessie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.