Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lyman, Grant-Robert, filed a(n) Other Civil Filing case represented by Pro Se, against Green Tree, Financial Default Services, represented by James H. Woodall, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Cory, Kenneth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryOther Civil Filing |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2008 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TRO PURSUANT TO FRCP RULE 65B | |
March 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion PLTF'S MTN FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Relief Clerk: Nora Pena Heard By: Ken Cory Upon call to Mr. Woodall's office, his staff indicated he was not available; therefore, COURT ORDERED, matter Trailed. MATTER RECALLED: Mr. Woodall via telephone moved on his motion to dismiss. COURT ORDERED, Pltf's motion for Preliminary Injunction is MOOT and Mr. Woodall's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Mr. Woodall to prepare the order. Judge: Cory, Kenneth |
|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
March 10, 2008 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO MTN TO DISMISS | |
March 01, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS | |
February 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type CASH BOND #01413783 $300.00 |
|
February 29, 2008 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER | |
February 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion PLTF'S MTN FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION |
|
February 28, 2008 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.