Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Robinson, Walter J, Robinson, Juanita, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Pro Se, against Cadle, Brigitte, represented by George M. Ranalli, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Leavitt, Michelle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment Plus Legal Interest |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 20 Reassigned From Judge Leavitt - Dept 12 |
|
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Order for Disposal of Exhibits | |
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
November 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Order for Counsel to Withdraw |
|
November 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Bret O Whipple & Adam L Gill's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Ms. Mondragon advised the motion is not opposed. COURT ORDERED, Motion GRANTED. RECALLED: Bret O. Whipple, Esq. now present. Court advised Mr. Whipple the Motion was granted and DIRECTED counsel to prepare the order. Judge: Ames, Jack |
|
October 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment on Order Granting the Defendant's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs | |
October 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment on Order | |
October 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
October 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Order | |
October 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion for Fees Vacated Judge: Leavitt, Michelle |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.