Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gianforte, Michael, filed a(n) Business Court case represented by Neil B. Durrant, against Zartman, George, Sealey, Dianne M, Schwarz, David, Scheller, Donna, Oakwood Mortgage And Real Estate Inc, (total of 26) See All represented by D. Chris Albright, Michael M. Edwards, Kenneth P. Hazouri, Marilyn G Fine, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Gonzalez, Elizabeth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 20, 2007 |
CategoryBusiness Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order To Statistically Close Case |
|
October 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Order Re JDI Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment or Alternatively to Dismiss | |
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Demand for Security of Costs JDI Realty, LLC's Demand for Security for Costs to Debra Ann Ritchey |
|
September 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Consent to Service By Electronic Means | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Amended Certificate of Service | |
April 20, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT | |
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER | |
April 07, 2009 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT | |
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
April 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.