Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Simac Construction Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Michael D Stevenson, against Stookey, John, Pecos Acquisition Llc, Huffman Builders West Llc, represented by Nickolas A. Amon, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Tao, Jerome T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTao, Jerome T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 27, 2007 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeSatisfaction Of Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change From Vacant DC8 to Judge Trevor L. Atkin Judge: ChangeFrom Vacant DC8 to Judge Trevor L. Atkin |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 8 Judicial Reassignment to Department 8 - Vacant DC8 Judge |
|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 9 Judicial Reassignment - From Judge Bailus to Vacant, DC9 |
|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 18 Reassigned From Judge Jones - Dept 29 |
|
July 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 29 Civil Case Reassignment to Judge David M. Jones |
|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 20 Case reassigned from Judge Jerome Tao Dept 20 |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
January 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 20 Case reassigned from Judge Togliatti, Jennifer |
|
July 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution | |
July 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.