Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hogue, Karli Paige, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Mark E. Peplowski, against Hogue, Kiley James, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Vincent Ochoa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department S Judicial Reassignment - From Judge Linda Marquis to Judge Vincent Ochoa |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judicial Elections 2014 - Case Reassignment Family Court Judicial Officer Reassignment 2014 Judge: Reassignment 2014 |
|
January 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department B Case reassigned from Judge Charles J. Hoskin Dept E |
|
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion Deft's Motion For Qualified Domestic Relations Order Judge: Hoskin, Charles J. |
|
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relation Order - Family | |
December 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order Motion for Qualified Domestic Relations Order |
|
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion for Qualified Domestic Relations Order | |
January 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassigned from Department K to Department E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.