Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bromley, Joan, Mcghie, Susan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Young, David, Bromley, Joan, represented by Phillip R Emerson, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Miley, Stefany presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Approving Minor'S Compromise |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Disburse Funds From Compromise of Minors Claim Order Certifying That Petitioner Has Reached The Age of 18 Years and Closing Blocked Trust Account |
|
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Petition to Disburse Money From Compromise of Minors Claim Ex Parte Petition to Close Blocked Trust Account |
|
October 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account No Parties Present. COURT FINDS proof provided and ORDERED, CASE CLOSED. Judge: Miley, Stefany |
|
September 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Establishment of Blocked Trust Account | |
August 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Compromising Minors Claim Order Approving Petition to Compromise Minor's Claim |
|
July 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Amended Petition to Compromise Minor's Claim | |
July 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Order Approving Substitution of Petitioner | |
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Order Approving Substitution of Petitioner | |
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Hearing Re: Substitution of Petitioner Samuel Mirkovich, Esq., present on behalf of Plaintiff. There being no opposition, COURT ORDERED, Motion GRANTED. Order SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. Judge: Miley, Stefany |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.