Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Daniely, Sheryl, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brian D. Nettles, against Quick Tow Inc, Darnold, Jack, represented by Steven R. Bartell, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Denton, Mark R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Status Check Vacated Judge: Denton, Mark R. |
|
August 13, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
August 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated Judge: Denton, Mark R. |
|
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
August 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
CALENDAR CALL Court Clerk: Sue Burdette Heard By: Mark Denton COURT finds this case has settled; and ORDERED, Trial date of August 12, 2008, VACATED; matter set for STATUS CHECK. 11-24-08 2:45 PM STATUS CHECK: SETTLEMENT DOCUMENTS Judge: Denton, Mark R. |
|
August 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type STATUS CHECK: SETTLEMENT DOCUMENTS (VO 08-07-08) |
|
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Conference PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Court Clerk: Sue Burdette Heard By: Mark Denton IN CHAMBERS: Counsel advised a mediation is scheduled for this Friday. Court advised counsel to contact Chambers if the matter settles in the mediation; and if there is a consensus for a Settlement Conference, counsel to contact the Court's Judicial Executive Assistant for assistance in scheduling same. Counsel advised this trial will take three (3) to four (4) days, and one (1) Alternate juror will be sufficient. Upon Court's inquiry, counsel requested not to go to overflow. COURT stated the due date for the filing of the Pretrial Memorandum will be given at the Calendar Call; and ORDERED, Calendar Call and Trial date to STAND. Judge: Denton, Mark R. |
|
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT | |
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event | INITIAL APPEARANCE FEE DISCLOSURE | |
December 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type PRETRIAL CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.