Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Reyes, Angela, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Steven Lynn Day, against Creative Beginnings Inc, represented by Alan W Westbrook, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Vega, Valorie J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVega, Valorie J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2000 |
CategoryNegligence - Other Negligence |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 15 Case reassigned from Judge Richard F Scotti Dept 2 |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judicial Elections 2014 - Case Reassignment District Court Judicial Officer Reassignment 2014 Judge: Reassignment 2014 |
|
May 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated Judge: Vega, Valorie J. |
|
May 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated Judge: Vega, Valorie J. |
|
April 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Conference Vacated Judge: Vega, Valorie J. |
|
February 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account Vacated Judge: Vega, Valorie J. |
|
January 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
Filed Under Seal PROOF OF BLOCKED FINANCIAL INVESTMENT ACCOUNT ON BEHALF OF MINOR COMPROMISE KEKOA REYES |
|
December 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
Filed Under Seal NTC OF ENTRY OF ORDER |
|
December 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Filed Under Seal STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
December 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Judgment ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.