Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fields, Shannon Patrick, filed a(n) Child Custody Complaint case represented by Pro Se, against Fisher, Charo, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2002 |
CategoryChild Custody Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassigned from Department J to Department R |
|
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Agreement Partial Parenting Agreement |
|
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing FMC Mediation Judge: Kent, Lisa M |
|
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Order for Family Mediation Center Services | |
October 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion for Child Custody
Judge: Kent, Lisa M |
|
October 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
September 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Reply Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Opposition and Countermotion |
|
September 24, 2007 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
September 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Financial Condition | |
September 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Family Court Motion Opposition Fee Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.