Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hildreth, Jacqueline Y, Hildreth Sr, Leslie E, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Kent, Lisa M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2002 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDivorce Granted |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judicial Elections 2014 - Case Reassignment Family Court Judicial Officer Reassignment 2014 Judge: Reassignment 2014 |
|
January 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department T Case reassigned from Department E |
|
January 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassigned from Department J to Department E |
|
June 30, 2005 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF SCH/PER Date: 06/30/2005 Blackstone OC: | |
June 30, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SCH/PER Date: 06/30/2005 Blackstone OC: | |
June 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Document Archive | |
June 28, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER AFTER HEARING SCH/PER Date: 03/17/2004 Blackstone OC: HG | |
March 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing RETURN: OUTSOURCED EVALUATION Judge: Kent, Lisa M |
|
January 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing RETURN: OUTSOURCED EVALUATION Judge: Kent, Lisa M |
|
December 29, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SCH/PER Date: 12/29/2004 Blackstone OC: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.