Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Las Vegas Auto Leasing Inc, filed a(n) Civil Writ case represented by Dale K. Kleven, against Tartamella, Nancy J, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Mark R. Denton presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2002 |
CategoryCivil Writ |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2005 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR REINSTATEMENT PURSUANT TO EDCR 2.90 | |
February 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
HEARING DISMISSAL Court Clerk: Sue Burdette Heard By: Mark Denton COURT finds there are no appearances; finds no cause has been shown why this action should not be dismissed, and ORDERED, case DISMISSED and CLOSED. Judge: Denton, Mark R. |
|
January 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause ORDER SCHEDULING DISMISSAL HEARING |
|
January 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type HEARING DISMISSAL |
|
February 10, 2003 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing HEARING RE: SHOW CAUSE /1 Court Clerk: Sue Burdette Heard By: Mark Denton COURT ORDERED, matter OFF CALENDAR at request of counsel as the car has been returned. Judge: Denton, Mark R. |
|
December 31, 2002 | Docket Event |
Motion HEARING RE: SHOW CAUSE /1 |
|
December 20, 2002 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
December 20, 2002 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FOR CLAIM AND DELIVERY | |
December 20, 2002 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED Fee $133.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.