Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Trejo, Rufino R, Landeros, Ana, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Lueck, Robert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLueck, Robert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2001 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDivorce Granted |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassigned from Department E to Department P |
|
August 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Withdrawal of Attorney Notice Of; For Plaintiff |
|
August 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Firm Address |
|
July 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
May 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order From Hearing April 22, 2008 |
|
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Status Check Re: Resolution Judge: Pomrenze, Sandra |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing
Judge: Pomrenze, Sandra |
|
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Pre-trial Memorandum Defendant's |
|
March 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Defendant's First Supplement to List of Witnesses |
|
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.