Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Courtright, Georgene M, Courtright Jr, Edgar D, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Moss, Cheryl B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMoss, Cheryl B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2001 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judicial Elections 2014 - Case Reassignment Family Court Judicial Officer Reassignment 2014 Judge: Reassignment 2014 |
|
January 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department T Case reassigned from Department M |
|
July 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Exhibits Receipt of Exhibits ; Exhibits #1, #3, #4, & #5 admitted 8-19-04 & 11-14-04 |
|
July 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order To Release Exhibits |
|
July 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disposal of Exhibits | |
July 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Petition and Order to Destroy / Dispose of Exhibits | |
June 22, 2006 | Docket Event | RELEASE OF ATTORNEYS LIEN SCH/PER Date: 06/22/2006 Blackstone OC: | |
April 17, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ATTORNEY LIEN SCH/PER Date: 04/17/2006 Blackstone OC: | |
April 05, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY SCH/PER Date: 04/05/2006 Blackstone OC: | |
March 15, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER AND NOTICE OF RELOCATION OF LAW OFFICE SCH/PER Date: 03/15/2006 Blackstone OC: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.