Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Imerti, Adria, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mark A Kulla, against Terra Contracting Inc, Stokes Underground Consulting Llc, John Laing Mortgage, represented by Brian K. Terry, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Togliatti, Jennifer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTogliatti, Jennifer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2001 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 9 Judicial Reassignment to Department 9 - Judge Cristina Silva |
|
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike DEFT WL HOMES' MTN TO STRIKE PLTFS' 3 DAY NTC TO TAKE DEFAULT/MTN TO DISMISS/3 Court Clerk: Keith Reed Heard By: Joseph Bonaventure Mr. Kulla advised the Court, at the time matters were placed on calendar, he was unaware the Deft. was served with a dismissal from Department IX; even if the Court should grant the motion, or allow a default, the 5 year rule has run. Mr. Kulla requested the Court allow the prior order dismissing the case without prejudice stand. There being no opposition, COURT ORDERED, motion GRANTED; ruling DISMISSING case WITHOUT PREJUDICE STANDS. Mr. Bemis stated, the 5 year limit has run. |
|
December 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion DEFT WL HOMES' MTN TO STRIKE PLTFS' 3 DAY NTC TO TAKE DEFAULT/MTN TO DISMISS/3 |
|
December 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Three Day Notice of Intent to Default THREE DAY NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DEFAULT |
|
May 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Judgment ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
May 11, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
December 02, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER | |
October 21, 2004 | Docket Event |
Motion to Consolidate DEFT WL HOMES' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH A444396 /2 Court Clerk: Alan Castle Heard By: Jennifer Togliatti Court note non-opposition filed and ORDERS, motion GRANTED. By way of this minute order Mr. Kulla to prepare the order and notify all interested parties. CLERK'S NOTE: The above Minute Order has been distributed to: Spilotro & Kulla. ****************SEE LEAD CASE A444396 FOR ALL FUTURE MINUTES*************** Judge: Togliatti, Jennifer |
|
September 23, 2004 | Docket Event |
Motion DEFT WL HOMES' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH A444396 /2 |
|
December 31, 2002 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.