Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Morales, Alfonso, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Christopher Jon Raleigh, against Prudential Insurance Co Of America, Psi Partners Inc, Skoll, Jeffrey A, represented by Ann-Martha Andrews, William R. Urga, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Smith, Douglas E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSmith, Douglas E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2001 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 9 Judicial Reassignment to Department 9 - Judge Cristina Silva |
|
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Order to Statistically Close Case | |
July 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order for Return of Cost Bond Request for Order to Release Funds |
|
July 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order A443566 & A453498 |
|
July 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice A443566 & A453498 Stipulation And Order Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion Vacated Judge: Smith, Douglas E. |
|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated Judge: Smith, Douglas E. |
|
April 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Vacated Judge: Smith, Douglas E. |
|
April 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated Judge: Smith, Douglas E. |
|
April 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Notification of Media Request |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.