Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brown, John filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Cynthia D. Steel presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2000 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Adult |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department M Case reassigned from Judge Cynthia Dianne Steel Dept G |
|
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Administrative Reassignment to Department G | |
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Order to Statistically Close Case | |
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Waiving Accounting and Request for Case Closure and Distribution of Assests | |
November 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit Waiving Accounting And Request For Case Closure And Distribution Of Assets | |
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Termination | |
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Approving Petition for Release of Funds from Blocked Account | |
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Release of Funds From Blocked Account | |
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Approving Petition For Release Of Funds From Blocked Account | |
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Release of Funds from Blocked Account |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.