Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Harry, Jerrildine filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Cynthia D. Steel presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 02, 2000 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Adult |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Report of the Guardian 08/28/2019 to 08/19/2020 | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Report of the Guardian of the Adult Person (9/17/18 - 8/28/19) | |
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Compliance Letter Mailed ROG |
|
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Report of the Guardian | |
August 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Report of the Guardian of the Adult Person 07/19/2016 through 08/22/2017 | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department M Case reassigned from Judge Cynthia Dianne Steel Dept G |
|
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Report of the Guardian | |
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Report of the Guardian | |
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Re-Notice of Hearing |
|
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Status Check
Judge: O'Malley, Gloria |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.