Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nielsen, Stephen K, Nielsen, Elizabeth D, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Jones, Steven E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2000 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDivorce Granted |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judicial Elections 2014 - Case Reassignment Family Court Judicial Officer Reassignment 2014 Judge: Reassignment 2014 |
|
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department C Case reassigned from Judge Robert Teuton Dept D |
|
July 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassignment from Judge Steel to Judge Hardcastle |
|
August 01, 2006 | Docket Event | Document Archive | |
August 01, 2006 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SCH/PER Date: 07/06/2006 Blackstone OC: TP | |
July 06, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SCH/PER Date: 07/06/2006 Blackstone OC: | |
July 06, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER SCH/PER Date: 07/06/2006 Blackstone OC: HG | |
July 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion DEFT'S MOTION FOR CHANGE IN ORDER FOR CHILD SUPPORT Judge: Steel, Cynthia Dianne |
|
July 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Child Support and Welfare Party Identification Sheet CHILD SUPPORT AND WELFARE PARTY IDENTIFICATION SHEET SCH/PER Date: Blackstone OC: |
|
June 07, 2006 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SCH/PER Date: 06/07/2006 Blackstone OC: TP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.