Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cosgrove, Jeanne, Cosgrove, Craig D, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2000 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judicial Elections 2014 - Case Reassignment Family Court Judicial Officer Reassignment 2014 Judge: Reassignment 2014 |
|
July 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition & Countermotion Vacated - No Service Judge: Miley, Stefany |
|
July 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause Vacated - No Service Judge: Miley, Stefany |
|
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Financial Condition Craig Cosgrove- Amended |
|
June 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Opposition and Countermotion | |
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause Jeanne Cosgrove's Motion for an Order to Show Cause Judge: Miley, Stefany |
|
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion | |
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Family Court Motion Opposition Fee Information Sheet | |
April 24, 2007 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing RETURN: CHILD SUPPT ARREAR/MEDICAL INSURANCE PREMIUM ARREARS Judge: Miley, Stefany |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.