Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bailey, Mark, filed a(n) Child Custody Complaint case represented by Pro Se, against Dixon, Tricia, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2000 |
CategoryChild Custody Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice Of Entry Of Order | |
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion to Clarify Pltf's Motion for Clarification of Current Order Regarding Travel Costs and Reimbursements, Resolve Issues and Disputes Regarding Flexibility, Compel and Enforce Orders Regarding Photographs, Report Cards and Monitored Phone Calls, Order That Child is Covered by Dad's Insurance and Attorney's Fees Judge: Ritchie, T. Arthur, Jr. |
|
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion for Clarification of Current Order Regarding Travel Costs and Reimbursements; to Resolve Issues and Disputes Regarding Flexibility of Mother Towards Father's Visitation Schedule In Light of Father's Pending Deployment and the History of Exchanges Between the Parties with Their Child; To Compel and Enforce Orders Regarding Photographs, Report Cards; and Monitored Phone Calls; That the Court Order That the Child is Covered By Dad's Insurance Through the Military; for Plaintiff's Costs and/or Attorney's Fees; and Related Matters | |
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion for Clarification of Current Order Regarding Travel Costs and Reimbursements; to Resolve Issues and Disputes Regarding Flexibility of Mother Towards Father's Visitation Schedule in Light of Father's Pending Deployment and the History of Exchanges Between the Parties with Their Child; to Compel and Enforce Orders Regarding Photographs, Report Cards; and Monitored Phone Calls; That the Court Order That the Child is Covered by Dad's Insurance Through the Military; For Plaintiff's Costs and/or Attorney's Fees; and Related Matters | |
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event | Order | |
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Status Check PARENTING COORDINATOR Judge: Ritchie, T. Arthur, Jr. |
|
January 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department H Case reassigned from Department B |
|
December 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Rescheduling of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.