Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Madera, Karry N, Madera, Jorge, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Kent, Lisa M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2000 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDivorce Granted |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassigned from Department J to Department E |
|
May 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
May 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order From Hearing 04/22/08 |
|
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion for Child Custody Jorge Madera's Motion to Confirm the Custody Order from California, Child Support Judge: Kent, Lisa M |
|
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition & Countermotion Karry Braddock's Opposition and Countermotion Judge: Kent, Lisa M |
|
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions
Judge: Kent, Lisa M |
|
March 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing Reply To Opposition And CounterMotion |
|
March 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Opposition And Countermotion |
|
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Opposition and Countermotion | |
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.