Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Del Vecchio, N Anthony presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2000 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order
Judge: Mercer, Shell |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Notice to Statistically Close Case Doc ID# 51 [51] Domestic Notice to Statistically Close Case |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Mercer, Shell |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Doc ID# 50 [50] Plaintiff Motion for Retirement 401K etc Sam our son tricked me. |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department Z Case Reassignment - Judicial Officer Shell Mercer Judge: Shell Mercer |
|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Qualified Domestic Relation Order Doc ID# 49 [49] Qualified Domestic Relations Order |
|
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department E Case reassigned from Judge Cynthia Giuliani Dept K |
|
January 12, 2004 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 46 [46] PETITION AND ORDER TO DESTROY OR DISPOSE OF EXHIBITS SCH/PER Date: 01/12/2004 Blackstone OC: |
|
January 12, 2004 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing Doc ID# 47 [47] CERTIFICATE OF DISPOSAL OF EXHIBITS SCH/PER Date: 01/12/2004 Blackstone OC: |
|
January 12, 2004 | Docket Event | Document Archive Doc ID# 48 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.