Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Whitman, Wendy, Whitman, Wendell, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2000 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order | |
November 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
February 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order | |
January 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
January 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassigned from Department H to Department N |
|
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Document Archive | |
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL OF RECORD SCH/PER Date: 01/29/2007 Blackstone OC: | |
January 23, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
January 19, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER RE: DECEMBER 11,2006 HEARING SCH/PER Date: 12/11/2006 Blackstone OC: HG | |
December 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion DEFT'S MOTION TO CONFIRM CUSTODY, MODIFYCHILD SUPPORT, CONTEMPT, SPOUSAL SUPPORT Judge: Ritchie, T. Arthur, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.