Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sant, Randall T, Sant, Jenny L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Voy, William O presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2000 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDivorce Granted |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department I Civil Domestic Case Reassignment from Judge David Gibson Jr. Department L |
|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change Judicial Reassignment - From Judge Jennifer Elliott to Judge David Gibson Jr. Judge: ChangeJudicial Reassignment - From Judge Jennifer Elliott to Judge David Gibson Jr. |
|
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department L Case reassigned from Judge Cynthia Giuliani Dept K |
|
March 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing STATUS CHECK: CHILD SUPPORT REVIEW Judge: Del Vecchio, N Anthony |
|
December 10, 2004 | Docket Event | Document Archive | |
December 10, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STATUS CHECK SCH/PER Date: 12/10/2004 Blackstone OC: | |
December 07, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing STATUS CHECK: CHILD SUPPORT REVIEW Judge: Del Vecchio, N Anthony |
|
September 13, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SCH/PER Date: 09/13/2004 Blackstone OC: | |
August 19, 2004 | Docket Event |
Order STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE AUGUST 19 2004 STATUS CHECK SCH/PER Date: 12/07/2004 Blackstone OC: SH |
|
August 19, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing STATUS CHECK: CHILD SUPPORT REVIEW Judge: Del Vecchio, N Anthony |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.