Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Woodard, Robert B, Woodard, Christine, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Voy, William O presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 24, 2000 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDivorce Granted |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department H Civil Domestic Case Reassignment from Judge David Gibson Jr. Department L |
|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change Judicial Reassignment - From Judge Jennifer Elliott to Judge David Gibson Jr. Judge: ChangeJudicial Reassignment - From Judge Jennifer Elliott to Judge David Gibson Jr. |
|
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department L Case reassigned from Department S |
|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Withdrawal of Attorney Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record |
|
May 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Child Support and Welfare Party Identification Sheet | |
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order |
|
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Child Support and Welfare Party Identification Sheet | |
February 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order of Stipulation and Order |
|
February 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.