Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cowin, Sandra R, Cowin, John R, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Lueck, Robert presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2000 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDivorce Granted |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassigned from Department E to Department P |
|
March 31, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SCH/PER Date: 03/31/2006 Blackstone OC: | |
March 31, 2006 | Docket Event | Document Archive | |
March 30, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO REDUCE ARREARAGES TO JUDGMENT SCH/PER Date: 01/18/2006 Blackstone OC: HG | |
January 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion DEFT'S MOTION TO REDUCE ARREARAGES TO JUDGMENT Judge: Pomrenze, Sandra |
|
December 23, 2005 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SCH/PER Date: 12/22/2005 Blackstone OC: | |
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice RENOTICE OF MOTION SCH/PER Date: 01/18/2006 Blackstone OC: SH |
|
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion DEFT'S MOTION TO REDUCE ARREARAGES TO JUDGMENT SCH/PER Date: 01/18/2006 Blackstone OC: GR |
|
December 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion Vacated Judge: Pomrenze, Sandra |
|
December 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion DEFT'S MOTION TO REDUCE ARREARAGES TO JUDGMENT (VC/VL 12/12/05 CC) Judge: Pomrenze, Sandra) DEFT'S MOTION TO REDUCE ARREARAGES TO JUDGMENT (VC/VL 12/12/05 CC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.