Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Poole, Theresa A, Poole, Robert J, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with David Gibson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2000 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDivorce Granted |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department H Civil Domestic Case Reassignment from Judge David Gibson Jr. Department L |
|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change Judicial Reassignment - From Judge Jennifer Elliott to Judge David Gibson Jr. Judge: ChangeJudicial Reassignment - From Judge Jennifer Elliott to Judge David Gibson Jr. |
|
February 14, 2006 | Docket Event | Document Archive | |
February 14, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL SCH/PER Date: 02/14/2006 Blackstone OC: | |
October 04, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SCH/PER Date: 10/04/2005 Blackstone OC: | |
October 04, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER SCH/PER Date: 01/11/2005 Blackstone OC: HG | |
January 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Agreement PARENTING AGREEMENT SCH/PER Date: Blackstone OC: |
|
January 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing RETURN: FMC CHILD INTERVIEW/PARENTING PLAN Judge: Elliott, Jennifer |
|
November 23, 2004 | Docket Event | RETURN: FMC CHILD INTERVIEW/PARENTING PLAN SCH/PER Date: 01/11/2005 Blackstone OC: PP | |
November 23, 2004 | Docket Event |
Motion ALL PENDING MOTIONS 11/23/04 Judge: Elliott, Jennifer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.