Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Celaya, Malisa, Apodaca, Frank, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with David S. Gibson, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2000 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department N Civil Domestic Case Reassignment from Judge David Gibson Jr. Department L |
|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change Judicial Reassignment - From Judge Jennifer Elliott to Judge David Gibson Jr. Judge: ChangeJudicial Reassignment - From Judge Jennifer Elliott to Judge David Gibson Jr. |
|
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department L Case reassigned from Department G |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department G Case reassigned from Department C |
|
June 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing FMC Child Interview Judge: Jones, Steven E |
|
March 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Financial Disclosure Form | |
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Order for Family Mediation Center Services | |
March 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion for Contempt Frank Apodaca's Motion for Contempt of Court Re: Child Support; Drug Test; Sanctions Against Deft; Judgment to Arrears; Child Support Judge: Jones, Steven E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.