Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Davis, Willie, Davis, Cynthia N, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Gonzalez, William B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzalez, William B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2000 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department S Civil Domestic Case Reassignment from Judge David Gibson Jr. Department L |
|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change Judicial Reassignment - From Judge Jennifer Elliott to Judge David Gibson Jr. Judge: ChangeJudicial Reassignment - From Judge Jennifer Elliott to Judge David Gibson Jr. |
|
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department L Case reassigned from Department F |
|
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order From Hearing | |
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing 12/20/10 | |
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion to Offset Order
Judge: Gonzalez, William B |
|
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Opposition & Countermotion Deft's Opposition & Countermotion Judge: Gonzalez, William B |
|
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions
Judge: Gonzalez, William B |
|
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Reply Plaintiff Willie Davis' Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Change in Order and Opposition to Countermotion |
|
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Opposition to Motion for Change in Order and Countermotion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.