Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sangrey, Lisa R, filed a(n) Child Custody Complaint case represented by Tracy M. Rau, Esq, against Davis, Timothy A, represented by Ethan Kottler, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Jones, Steven E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 16, 2000 |
CategoryChild Custody Complaint |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassigned from Department I to Department R |
|
July 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassignment from Judge Jones to Judge Moss |
|
August 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Document Archive | |
August 29, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SCH/PER Date: 08/29/2006 Blackstone OC: | |
August 22, 2006 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ON C/S ARREARAGES SCH/PER Date: 08/23/2006 Blackstone OC: | |
August 22, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER SCH/PER Date: 06/12/2006 Blackstone OC: HG | |
June 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion ALL PENDING MOTIONS 6-12-06 Judge: Jones, Steven E |
|
June 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing DEFT'S OPPOSITION AND COUNTERMOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES Judge: Jones, Steven E |
|
June 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion PLTF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Judge: Jones, Steven E |
|
June 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion ALL PENDING MOTIONS 6-12-06 SCH/PER Date: 06/12/2006 Blackstone OC: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.