Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Frank, Mindy L, Frank, Keith H, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Sanchez, Gloria S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSanchez, Gloria S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 01, 2000 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDivorce Granted |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department H Case reassigned from Department R |
|
October 11, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
July 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department R Reassigned from Department O |
|
January 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassigned from Department B to Department O |
|
November 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated Judge: Sanchez, Gloria S |
|
October 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated Judge: Sanchez, Gloria S |
|
September 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing MINUTE ORDER RE: AUGUST 9, 2006 DECISION SCH/PER Date: 09/27/2006 Blackstone OC: |
|
September 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Converted From Blackstone MINUTE ORDER RE: AUGUST 9, 2006 DECISION Judge: Marren, Terrance P. |
|
September 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing EVIDENTIARY HEARING (4 HOURS) (VJ 8/9/06 CC) Judge: Sanchez, Gloria S) EVIDENTIARY HEARING (4 HOURS) (VJ 8/9/06 CC |
|
August 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing STATUS CHECK (1 HOUR) SCH/PER Date: 11/01/2006 Blackstone OC: VC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.