Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Valenzuela, Troy A, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Jackie Glass presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2000 |
CategoryCriminal Drug Court Petition |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 18 Reassigned From Judge Escobar - Dept 14 |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 14 District Court Case Reassignment 2015 |
|
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 7 Case reassigned from Judge Delaney |
|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 25 Case reassigned from Judge Jackie Glass |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Specialty Court Reassignment Case reassigned from Judge Elliot to Judge Glass |
|
November 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER RE: QUASH BW/CLOSE CASE Court Clerk: Jeanette Singer Heard By: Jack Lehman CASH BAIL in the amount of $125 ($95 owed to Choices, $30 to the Court), having been PAID IN FULL on 11/21/05, COURT ORDERED, bench warrant QUASHED and case closed. CASE CLOSED |
|
November 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing MINUTE ORDER RE: QUASH BW/CLOSE CASE |
|
November 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type STATUS CHANGE: ACTIVE TO WARRANT |
|
July 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
STATUS CHECK: FEES/TERMINATED Relief Clerk: Robin Mucciarone Reporter/Recorder: Debra Van Blaricom Heard By: Jack Lehman Petitioner not present. COURT ORDERED, A CASH ONLY BENCH WARRANT WILL ISSUE IN THE AMOUNT OF $125. When paid, Choices will receive $95 and the Court $30. Includes $30 fine. |
|
July 12, 2005 | Docket Event | BENCH WARRANT ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.