Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Torrez, Michelle, Rothman, Lisa, Kincaid, Robin, Estate Of Jerald Cohen, Cohen, Harriet, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) Product Liability case represented by Alan S. Levin, against Walgreen Co, Umc Pharmacy, Smith Md, Paul, Sav On Drug Stores, Sapenza-Schaeffer, Phyllis, (total of 11) See All represented by Lynn Marie Hansen, Thomas P. Beko, Denise Anne Barton, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Glass, Jackie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2000 |
CategoryProduct Liability |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeClerk'S Certificate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 15 Case reassigned from Judge Richard F Scotti Dept 2 |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judicial Elections 2014 - Case Reassignment District Court Judicial Officer Reassignment 2014 Judge: Reassignment 2014 |
|
June 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 2 Reassigned from Department 5 |
|
April 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type LEFT SIDE FILE MINUTES |
|
August 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judgment CLERK'S CERTIFICATE JUDGMENT AFFIRMED |
|
December 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Judgment ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
December 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
March 30, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER | |
March 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Reporters Transcript REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT |
|
March 24, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.