Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Saxton Inc, filed a(n) Business Court case against South Valley Apartments Ltd Partnershi, Lend Lease Nevada Inc, represented by Philip M. Balliff, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Herndon, Douglas W. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2000 |
CategoryBusiness Court |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 11 Reassigned From Judge Hardy - Dept 15 |
|
July 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 15 Civil Case Reassignment to Judge Joe Hardy |
|
February 16, 2005 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
February 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Judgment ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
February 15, 2005 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
February 09, 2005 | Docket Event | RELEASE AND DISCHARGE OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION TO FORECLOSE ON MECHANICS LIEN | |
January 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial Vacated Judge: Hardcastle, Kathy |
|
January 27, 2005 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Judgment ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
January 25, 2005 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (A431441) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.