Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Saxton Inc, filed a(n) Business Court case against Lend Lease Nevada Inc, East Fremont Group Ltd Partnership, represented by Philip M. Balliff, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Herndon, Douglas W. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2000 |
CategoryBusiness Court |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 13 Civil Case Reassignment to Judge Mark R. Denton |
|
February 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
February 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Judgment ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
February 15, 2005 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
February 09, 2005 | Docket Event | RELEASE AND DISCHARGE OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION TO FORECLOSE ON MECHANICS LIEN | |
January 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial Vacated Judge: Hardcastle, Kathy |
|
January 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
January 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Judgment ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
January 25, 2005 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (A431441) | |
January 24, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.