Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Johnson, Al, Brott, Dena, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Benjamin Childs, against Cataldo, Joe, Apex Bulk Commodities Inc, represented by David Rl Sidran, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Leavitt, Michelle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2000 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 20 Reassigned From Judge Leavitt - Dept 12 |
|
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate of Destruction of Evidence and/or Depositions | |
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Petition and Order to Destroy / Dispose of Exhibits | |
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Order for Disposal of Exhibits | |
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order for Dismissal With Prejudice | |
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Order for Dismissal With Prejudice |
|
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Order to Statistically Close Case | |
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event | NV Supreme Court Clerks Certificate/Judgment - Affirmed | |
April 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Full and Final Satisfaction of Judgment | |
December 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment CLERK'S CERTIFICATE/REHEARING DENIED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.