Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chowdhry, Kausar, Chowdhry, Bashir, filed a(n) Other Civil Filing case represented by Brian K. Terry, against Distinctive General Contracting, T And F Marble And Granite Inc, represented by George E. Cromer, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Walsh, Jessie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2000 |
CategoryOther Civil Filing |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 3 Case Reassignment from Judge Tierra Jones to Judge Douglas W. Herndon |
|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change From Judge Jessie Walsh to Judge Tierra Jones Judge: ChangeFrom Judge Jessie Walsh to Judge Tierra Jones |
|
June 18, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER | |
June 13, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER | |
June 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment ORDER OF DISMISSAL (CERTAIN CLAIMS) |
|
March 20, 2007 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF DEFENDANT COUNTERCLAIMANTS SUBSITUTION OF ATTORNEYS | |
February 28, 2007 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEYS FOR T AND F MARBLE AND GRANITE INC | |
October 05, 2006 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY CONFERENCE Heard By: Thomas Biggar | |
September 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss DEFT CNTR CLAIMANTS T&F MARBLE'S MTN TO DISMISS PLTF 1ST AMND COMPLAINT/31 Court Clerk: Nora Pena Reporter/Recorder: Victoria Boyd Heard By: Jessie Walsh Mr. Cromer advised he is appearing for Mr. Grossman because he is ill. Argument by Mr. Cromer in support of his motion to dismiss. Opposition by Mr. Terry. Response by Mr. Cromer. Court stated findings, and ORDERED, Deft's motion is GRANTED, Counsel to prepare findings and facts of law. Mr. Cromer to prepare the order and pass it to Mr. Terry before submitting it to the Court. Judge: Walsh, Jessie |
|
September 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss DEFT CNTR CLAIMANTS T&F MARBLE'S MTN TO DISMISS PLTF 1ST AMND COMPLAINT/31 Court Clerk: Nora Pena Reporter/Recorder: Victoria Boyd Heard By: Jessie Walsh Judge: Walsh, Jessie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.