Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nicola, Ron, Rossi, Robert, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jerome A Depalma, against Rossi, Selena, Nicola, Ron, represented by Michael Pontoni, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Bell, Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 24, 2000 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 9 Judicial Reassignment to Department 9 - Judge Cristina Silva |
|
July 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
July 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Judgment ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
July 19, 2005 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
June 16, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
February 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial NON-JURY TRIAL Court Clerk: Tina Hurd Heard By: Stewart Bell Court advised this case has settled and ORDERED, matter OFF CALENDAR. |
|
January 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial Vacated |
|
January 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
CALENDAR CALL Court Clerk: Tina Hurd Heard By: Stewart Bell Counsel announced ready for trial; 1-2 days; oral contract, unjust enrichment. COURT ORDERED, this matter will proceed to trial on Wednesday. 2-2-05 10:00 AM NON-JURY TRIAL |
|
January 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Pre-trial Memorandum PRE TRIAL MEMORANDUM |
|
January 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Pre-trial Memorandum PLAINTIFFS PRE TRIAL MEMORANDUM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.