Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Estate Of Theo Ella Byrns, Byrns, Theo, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Brett A. Carter, against The Stanley Works Co, Kmart Corp, Automatic Entrance Systems Inc, represented by George Richard Lyles, Susan M Sherrod, Michael R Hall, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Adair, Valerie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 24, 2000 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 32 Civil Case Reassignment to Judge Rob Bare |
|
March 16, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER | |
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
July 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Joint Case Conference Report PLTF AND DEFT THE STANLEY WORK COMPANYS JOINT CASE CONFERENCE REPORT |
|
June 09, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING KMART CORPORATIONS MOTION TO ALTER ORAMENDED JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO NEVADA RULE OF CIVIL PROCUDURE 59(c) ON ORDER SHORTENING TIME | |
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING KMART CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT | |
May 30, 2006 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY | |
May 26, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING KMART CORPORATIONS MOTION TO ALTER OR AMENDED JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO NEVADA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 59 (E) ON ORDER SHORTENING TIME | |
May 26, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING KMART CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT | |
May 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
ALL PENDING MOTIONS (5/22/06) Relief Clerk: Greer Jennison Heard By: Valerie Adair AS TO DEFT KMART'S MTN TO ALTER/AMEND JUDGMENT: COURT ORDERED, motion is GRANTED TO THE EXTENT that the line in Pltf's order of 4/26/06 denying Deft. KMART's motion to dismiss is STRICKEN. AS TO DEFT KMART'S MTN FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT: COURT ORDERED, motion is GRANTED. Ms. Sherrod to prepare the orders within ten days and distribute a filed copy to all parties involved in this matter. CLERK'S NOTE: (5/22/06) A copy of this minute order to be placed in the attorney folder(s) of Susan M. Sherrod Esq. (Atkin Winner et al), Brett Carter Esq. (Benson Bertoldo et al), George R. Lyles Esq. (Rawlings Olson et al) and Karl Armstrong Esq. (Cisneros & Associates). Judge: Adair, Valerie) ALL PENDING MOTIONS (5/22/06 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.