Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
National Guaranty Insurance Co, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Donald H Williams, against Trophy Pools And Spas Inc, Timothy, Gary, Plain, Donald, Plain, Cindy, Flex Electric Inc, (total of 8) See All represented by W. Owen Nitz, Kenneth Calvin Cory, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Denton, Mark R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 08, 2000 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeRelease Of Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER | |
June 02, 2006 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISBURSEMENT OF BOND PROCEEDS | |
May 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion PLTF'S MOTION FOR RETURN OF MONIES ON DEPOSIT/5 Court Clerk: Sue Burdette Heard By: Mark Denton Mr. Williams stated he has reached a tentative agreement with the parties who were here last time, and advised he will submit a stipulated order in which all three (3) parties have signed off. COURT ORDERED, Pltf's Motion for Return of Monies on Deposit GRANTED; counsel to submit the Stipulation. Judge: Denton, Mark R. |
|
April 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion PLTF'S MOTION FOR RETURN OF MONIES ON DEPOSIT/5 Court Clerk: Sue Burdette Heard By: Mark Denton Mr. Williams stated there has been no opposition and noted Mr. Fontano has indicated he would like an opportunity to go through the files to determine that Deft has no handle on the money, noting the money is still there because certain claimants have not come in and claimed their money. Mr. Fontano stated he did not receive a notice of the dismissal and noted Mr. Williams submitted a copy to him. Mr. Timothy stepped forward and stated he never received any notification to come and pick up any money. Court finds some defaults were taken. Mr. Williams concurred. COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED; counsel to confer amongst themselves and Mr. Timothy. Judge: Denton, Mark R. |
|
March 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judgment RELEASE OF JUDGMENT |
|
March 29, 2006 | Docket Event | RELEASE OF JUDGMENT | |
March 27, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION | |
March 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion PLTF'S MOTION FOR RETURN OF MONIES ON DEPOSIT/5 |
|
November 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing HEARING RE: SHOW CAUSE Court Clerk: Sue Burdette Heard By: Mark Denton COURT finds there are no appearances; finds no cause has been shown why this action should not be dismissed; and ORDERED, case DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and CLOSED. Judge: Denton, Mark R. |
|
October 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type HEARING RE: SHOW CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.