Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Matt, Robin L, Matt, Donald J, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Robert Teuton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert Teuton Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2000 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judicial Elections 2014 - Case Reassignment Family Court Judicial Officer Reassignment 2014 Judge: Reassignment 2014 |
|
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department C Case reassigned from Judge Robert Teuton Dept D |
|
June 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution | |
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disposal of Exhibits | |
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Petition and Order to Destroy / Dispose of Exhibits | |
July 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassignment from Judge Steel to Judge Hardcastle |
|
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event | Document Archive | |
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT PLUS INTEREST BY DEFAULT SCH/PER Date: 03/29/2006 Blackstone OC: | |
February 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice THREE DAY NOTICE OF INTENT TO ENTER JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT SCH/PER Date: Blackstone OC: |
|
February 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion GREGG HUBLEY'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, SANCTIONS, FEES Judge: Steel, Cynthia Dianne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.