Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2004 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 13, 2021 |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Imaged File | |
May 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
April 25, 2005 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
September 20, 2004 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
July 16, 2004 | Docket Event | Subsequent Accounting | |
July 08, 2004 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
May 18, 2004 | Docket Event | Subsequent Accounting | |
May 17, 2004 | Docket Event | Subsequent Accounting | |
May 14, 2004 | Docket Event | Subpoena Received | |
April 19, 2004 | Docket Event | Subsequent Accounting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.