Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Cassidy, Alan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2018 |
CategoryGuardianship: Person/Relative |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Guardian of the Person Only | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Stat Closure: PR Permanent Letters Issued | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service | |
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail | |
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Order | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing - Probate | |
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.