We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Major Ray Sowell ,
filed a(n)
Wrongful Termination -
Labor and Employment
case
against
City Of Anaheim ,
David Belmer ,
Jared Moye ,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
with Thomas S. McConville presiding.
Judge
Thomas S. McConville
Filing Date
April 25, 2024
Category
Wrongful Termination
Last Refreshed
April 27, 2024
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Matter Type
Wrongful Termination
Case Events for
Major Ray Sowell v. City Of Anaheim
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
November 18, 2024
Hearing
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: MCCONVILLE
April 25, 2024
Docket Event
SOWELL, MAJOR RAY REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 04/25/2024.
April 25, 2024
Docket Event
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/18/2024 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C28 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Thomas S. McConville
Get Document
April 25, 2024
Docket Event
COMPLAINT FILED BY SOWELL, MAJOR RAY ON 04/25/2024
Get Document
April 25, 2024
Docket Event
CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCONVILLE, THOMAS ON 04/25/2024.
April 25, 2024
Docket Event
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOWELL, MAJOR RAY ON 04/25/2024
Get Document
April 25, 2024
Docket Event
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOWELL, MAJOR RAY ON 04/25/2024
Get Document
April 25, 2024
Docket Event
REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY SOWELL, MAJOR RAY ON 04/25/2024
April 25, 2024
Docket Event
ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/25/2024
Get Document
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.