Alysha Floyd,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
against
Robert Edward Heriford,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
with John C. Gastelum presiding.
Case Details for
Alysha Floyd v. Robert Edward Heriford
Case Events for
Alysha Floyd v. Robert Edward Heriford
Date
Type
Description
September 30, 2024
Hearing
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: DE LA CRUZ
April 18, 2024
Docket Event
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/30/2024 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: John C. Gastelum
April 18, 2024
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13401389 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13229575.
April 18, 2024
Docket Event
E-FILING TRANSACTION 21463117 RECEIVED ON 04/17/2024 02:33:51 PM.
April 17, 2024
Docket Event
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FLOYD, ALYSHA ON 04/17/2024
April 17, 2024
Docket Event
COMPLAINT FILED BY FLOYD, ALYSHA ON 04/17/2024
April 17, 2024
Docket Event
CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DE LA CRUZ, ANDRE ON 04/17/2024.
April 17, 2024
Docket Event
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FLOYD, ALYSHA ON 04/17/2024