We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Whitney Forbes ,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
against
Mazda Motor Of America, Inc. ,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
with Sheila Recio presiding.
Filing Date
April 16, 2024
Category
Breach Of Contract/Warranty
Last Refreshed
April 19, 2024
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Defendants
Mazda Motor Of America, Inc.
Other Parties
Law Offices Of Jon Jacobs (Attorney)
Case Events for
Whitney Forbes v. Mazda Motor Of America, Inc.
Date
Type
Description
September 23, 2024
Hearing
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: RECIO
April 17, 2024
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13400979 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13229170.
Get Document
April 17, 2024
Docket Event
E-FILING TRANSACTION 41640114 RECEIVED ON 04/16/2024 05:22:55 PM.
April 17, 2024
Docket Event
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/23/2024 AT 10:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Sheila Recio
Get Document
April 16, 2024
Docket Event
COMPLAINT FILED BY FORBES, WHITNEY ON 04/16/2024
Get Document
April 16, 2024
Docket Event
CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER RECIO, SHEILA ON 04/16/2024.
April 16, 2024
Docket Event
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FORBES, WHITNEY ON 04/16/2024
Get Document
April 16, 2024
Docket Event
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FORBES, WHITNEY ON 04/16/2024
Get Document
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.